Trustees LOUTH & DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Charity number: 1191121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Roy Chalder | Chair | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mike Armstrong | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Shaw | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wilson | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Fieldsend | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Walker | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sam Varrell | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wilson | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
andrew MACKENZIE | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEREK BLOW | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT NICHOLSON BOOTH | Trustee | 01 July 2000 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.