Accounts and annual returns AFRI GREEN CENTRE

Charity number: 1191113
Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 106 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 106 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 08 March 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 08 March 2023 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 02 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 02 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window