Governance THE DEVON FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Charity number: 1191427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 22 September 2020: CIO registration
- 02 November 2021: Funds received from 291301 WEST ALVINGTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 08 November 2021: Funds received from 1095770 SHEBBEAR WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 08 December 2021: Funds received from 1019699 OGWELL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 11 July 2023: Funds received from 1016290 LUSTLEIGH WOMENS INSTITUTE
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.