THE FORMBY CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 516789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.72k £2.26k £1.22k £4.86k £2.17k
Total expenditure £2.96k £2.87k £1.84k £5.79k £1.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A