Financial history WORCESTERSHIRE YMCA LIMITED

Charity number: 516872
Charity reporting is overdue by 129 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.45m £3.41m £4.44m £4.18m £4.44m
Total expenditure £3.12m £3.25m £3.88m £4.34m £4.28m
Income from government contracts £376.59k £142.94k £266.51k £266.94k £181.38k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £109.88k £417.27k
Income - Donations and legacies £37.66k £30.60k £45.95k £304.72k £2.40k
Income - Other trading activities £169.52k £187.46k £1.36m £966.64k £808.56k
Income - Charitable activities £3.24m £3.19m £3.03m £2.91m £3.53m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £209 £31 £31 £8 £31
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £97.08k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.12m £3.25m £3.60m £3.71m £3.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £282.49k £633.95k £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.41k £14.70k £0 £0 £26.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £833.24k