Financial history RHONDDA CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 516875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £958 £1.39k £439 £879 £0
Total expenditure £745 £2.63k £280 £1.22k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A