Governing document THE CORNER HOUSE YOUTH PROJECT
Charity number: 516970
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 OCTOBER 1983 AS AMENDED 18 SEPTEMBER 1985, 9 MAY 1989, 26 NOVEMBER 1992, 26 SEPTEMBER 1995, 11 SEPTEMBER 1997 AND 18 OCTOBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE YOUNG PEOPLE OF THE STOCKTON ON TEES AREA AND ESTABLISHMENT OF A STARTING POINT TO ADDRESS THE ISSUE OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND HEALTH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE CENTRAL STOCKTON AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.