Trustees ALL SAINTS CHURCH HIGHAMS PARK
Charity number: 1193213
Charity reporting is overdue by 248 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Malcolm Derek Porter | Chair | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Waldman | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Janet Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Mark Richard Williams | Trustee | 15 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Dupey | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michele Cecilia Henry | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elton Deighton Mottley | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Jean De'Ath | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diane Eve Jameson | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Constantine Chapman | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Anne Rogers | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HUGH WILLIAM HOLLOWAY | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mairwen Russell | Trustee | 26 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.