Financial history CHARITY OF FRED RALPH CARR FOR NECESSITOUS CLERGY IN THE ARCHDEACONRY OF NORTHUMBERLAND

Charity number: 517089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £563 £575 £586 £598 £610
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A