LEICESTER AREA QUAKER MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN

Charity number: 1192277
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Robert Frank Walker Trustee 08 November 2020 None on record
Hilary Ruth Ludlow Trustee 09 September 2018 None on record
James Stuart Deane Trustee 13 January 2019 None on record
Peter Frederick Burley Trustee 13 May 2018 None on record
Nicholas John Matthews Trustee 08 March 2020 None on record
Bridget Arregger Trustee 08 November 2020
BUCKBY LIBRARY & HUB Received: On time
Margery Anne Fishenden Trustee 08 November 2020 None on record
Jennifer Margaret Dnes Chair 10 January 2021 None on record