THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, WATERBEACH

Charity number: 1193952
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stuart Bradley Morris Trustee 01 June 2020 None on record
Dr JANE RATA WILLIAMSON MBE Trustee 01 April 1980
WATERBEACH TILLAGE HALL Received: On time
THE FARMLAND MUSEUM Received: 5 days late
Dr ROBERT MICHAEL WILLIAMSON Trustee 01 April 1973
THE FRIENDS OF ST JOHNS CHURCH WATERBEACH Received: On time
WATERBEACH TILLAGE HALL Received: On time
THE FARMLAND MUSEUM Received: 5 days late
Michael John Lynch Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record
Catherine Verity Alison Astley Trustee 01 April 2015 None on record
Paul James Tregoing Trustee 22 April 2018
THE WATERBEACH CHARITY Received: On time
James Christopher Bielby Trustee 26 November 2020 None on record
Andrew Mark Cotton Trustee 29 March 2021 None on record
Sarah Edwards Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Tiffany Georgina Langton Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record
Rev Paul Harnett Butler Chair 08 August 2012 None on record
Professor Richard Keith Stobart Trustee 14 April 2020 None on record
Richard Daniel Oakes Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
ADRIAN JAMES WRIGHT Trustee 01 April 1984
WATERBEACH MILITARY HERITAGE MUSEUM Received: On time
WATERBEACH VILLAGE SOCIETY Received: On time