Trustees ETNA COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1193501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Howes Chair 08 January 2016
None on record
Esther McCallum Trustee 24 June 2019
None on record
Katharine Mary Rodde Trustee 13 May 2019
RICHMOND BOROUGH MIND
Received: On time
Penelope Anne Croucher Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
Susan Chappell Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Geoff Acton Trustee 08 September 2017
None on record
Ian Fitzgerald Trustee 29 September 2015
None on record
Perminder Tamana Trustee 06 September 2014
None on record