THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, THURMASTON

Charity number: 1193394
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN MAURICE TEBBUTT Trustee 06 April 2008
THURMASTON OLD SCHOOL COMMUNITY CENTRE Received: On time
Andrea Jane Day Trustee None on record
Julie Ann Hewer Trustee None on record
Jason Joseph Jones Trustee None on record
MANDY FIONA GREEN Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
DAVID ANTONY LEWIS Trustee 06 April 2008
THURMASTON OLD SCHOOL COMMUNITY CENTRE Received: On time
John David Hewer PGCE LLM Trustee None on record
David Ronald Beck Trustee None on record
SHEILA ELIZABETH LANGLEY Trustee 30 June 2006 None on record
Suzanne Gamble Trustee 01 May 1984
LIFE SKILL PROJECT INTERNATIONAL Recently registered
Angela Mary Taylor Trustee None on record
Stephen Mark Gamble BA Hons. Trustee 05 May 1984
LIFE SKILL PROJECT INTERNATIONAL Recently registered
MAUREEN ANN TEBBUTT Trustee 12 October 2020
THURMASTON OLD SCHOOL COMMUNITY CENTRE Received: On time
Lesley Ann Hyam Trustee None on record
DARREN JOHN GARTSIDE BA Trustee 15 April 2018
THURMASTON OLD SCHOOL COMMUNITY CENTRE Received: On time
Collette Marie Webster-Jones Trustee None on record
REV TIMOTHY ROBERT DAY Chair 25 June 2014
THURMASTON OLD SCHOOL COMMUNITY CENTRE Received: On time