Trustees SHEFFIELD MUSEUMS TRUST
Charity number: 1194032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Andrew MacDonald | Chair | 04 December 2020 |
|
|||||||
Dr Julie Patricia Banham | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Stephan Hollingshead | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Imogen Mary Sugrue Gamester | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Mary MCDonald | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Roger Noel Davison | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Martin Singer | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Lindsey Tyson-Green | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Richard McGloin | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Darren Chouings | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
James Robinson FSA | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Patrick Abel | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Maxine Greaves | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.