Trustees GOLDSMITHS STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1194727
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Isabelle lily Tarran Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Gammorah Gibson Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Luca Di Mambro Moor Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Nour Matar Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Levante Bauer Trustee 17 March 2023
None on record
Kofi Siaw Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Victoria Mu Zhen Chwa Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
Stephen William Spencer Norton Trustee 01 August 2020
NORTH SURREY GROUP SCOPE
Received: On time
ENHANCEABLE
Received: 42 days late
VILLIERS PARK EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
DEAF UNITY
Received: On time
SPEAKERS' CORNER TRUST
Overdue by 78 days
ENGLISH SPEAKING BOARD (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED
Received: On time