Trustees CLEFT
Charity number: 1194581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN SOMMERLAD | Chair | 14 May 2007 |
|
|
||||
Shonnelly Novintan | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Gwyther | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rona Caroline Slator | Trustee | 14 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David George Christopher Sainsbury | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Fell | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Richard | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIM GOODACRE | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marie Pinkstone | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Kaye Knowles | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tracy Morris | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Norman Hay | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ALLAN | Trustee | 02 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emily Anderson | Trustee | 25 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK JAMES DWYER | Trustee | 25 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.