Trustees SOCIAL ANXIETY ALLIANCE UK
Charity number: 1195520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Greening | Chair | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Russell Findlay | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liz Critchlow | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Francis | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Whitbread | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Peacey | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.