Trustees PENYFFORD SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 517642
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard MEMMORY | Chair | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Steve Wallace | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerri Bendon | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Crosby | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Robinson | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Briscoe | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH DOOLEY-MORRIS | Trustee | 19 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Steven LOVE | Trustee | 19 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHARON LOUISE BAKEWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRIS WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.