Financial history HOSPICE OF THE VALLEYS

Charity number: 517724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.07m £1.03m £1.05m £1.23m £1.90m
Total expenditure £1.43m £1.65m £1.67m £1.87m £1.77m
Income from government contracts £373.13k £120.89k N/A £3.50k £462.99k
Income from government grants £0 £231.97k £365.89k £82.60k £736.22k
Income - Donations and legacies £114.72k £96.97k £92.25k £93.87k £176.90k
Income - Other trading activities £188.98k £274.16k £361.93k £478.74k £309.62k
Income - Charitable activities £373.13k £352.86k £365.89k £439.30k £989.93k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £291.86k £306.00k £230.16k £216.49k £212.92k
Income - Other £100.67k £0 £0 £0 £209.28k
Income - Legacies £20.36k £1.00k £21.02k £2.70k £14.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.13m £1.27m £1.22m £1.37m £1.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £295.74k £377.62k £443.31k £495.58k £452.44k
Expenditure - Governance £99.42k £111.47k £127.84k £84.75k £75.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £29.81k £30.56k £27.74k £27.87k £25.31k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0