CYLCH MEITHRIN Y DELYN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main aim of the cylch is to provide a happy, friendly atmosphere in which children learn through the medium of Welsh. Language development is nurtured by games, stories, and songs that all feature prominently in each session of the Cylch.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People
3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Newport City
Governance
- 18 May 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIMBERLY ANN WILLIAMS | Chair | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Saunders | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|||||
SARAH JANE STEPHENSON-RIX | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.24k | £59.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.94k | £49.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 June 2023 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 June 2023 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF WELSH LANGUAGE WITHIN THE NEWPORT AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cylch Meithrin Y Delyn
Flying Start
Capel Crescent
NEWPORT
Gwent
- Phone:
- 07831798287
- Email:
- cmydelyncommittee@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window