AUDUS MEMORIAL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 518236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 01 December 1986: Standard registration
  • 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 22 August 2011: Re-registered
  • 09 June 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 03 July 2013: Re-registered
  • 09 June 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 11 July 2016: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property