Trustees CHARITY FOR THE USHER GALLERY
Charity number: 1196647
Charity reporting is overdue by 164 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN HARRUP WALTER | Chair | 25 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Kevin Christopher Byron | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Hilary Lee Bower | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Lockwood | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Denby | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Van Cleave Brainerd | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Newcomb Field | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Jones | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lord Patrick Thomas Cormack | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Philip Keith Bowman | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Wenham Whitton | Trustee | 04 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Robert Bernard Parker | Trustee | 04 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Janita Hazel Gleadow Elton | Trustee | 31 March 2004 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.