Financial history THE DURHAM SINGERS

Charity number: 518274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £24.18k £24.04k £7.59k £5.77k £16.02k
Total expenditure £23.06k £23.82k £11.47k £5.37k £18.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A