Trustees COSTUME AND TEXTILE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1197727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Jane Whiting | Chair | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Warren | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Bailey | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Edward Worth | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prudence Smith | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Celia Sutton | Trustee | 19 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Jackson | Trustee | 24 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philippa Lacey | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Elizabeth Violet White | Trustee | 23 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA COE | Trustee | 01 March 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.