Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S CHURCH, STOCKTON ON TEES
Charity number: 1195893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Arnold | Chair | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
FIONA JANE SPRATT | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Collins | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY FRANCES AITHWAITE | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Scott Linnett | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Craig Hird | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Faye Ellen Thompson | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Clive Spratt | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.