Trustees SOUTH SNOWDONIA SEARCH AND RESCUE TEAM
Charity number: 1195803
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Bratton | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kyle Jones | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prideaux Hattle | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arwyn Williams | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Mowatt | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Griffiths | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cinnamon Kirstine Lumsdon | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Rowlands | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.