Trustees FAMILY FEDERATION FOR WORLD PEACE AND UNIFICATION (UK)
Charity number: 1202107
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ajay Rai | Chair | 22 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Christopher Jones | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Kieran Timothy Hoyte | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Huey Er Fisher | Trustee | 03 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Timothy Paul Read | Trustee | 08 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.