MEDWAY CENTRE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 518564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £52.20k £52.04k £91.59k £88.85k £45.09k
Total expenditure £53.17k £54.10k £57.39k £60.58k £42.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £5.67k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £24.50k