REDDITCH ONE WORLD LINK - FRIENDS OF MTWARA

Charity number: 518609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.03k £2.37k £6.14k £2.83k £2.06k
Total expenditure £1.95k £3.15k £4.97k £1.34k £3.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A