Governing document WIRRAL FUND FOR CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JANUARY 1987 AS AMENDED 9 MARCH 1990, 6 MARCH 1992, 2 DECEMBER 1994, 24 APRIL 1998 AND 28 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONG CHILDREN WHO ARE RECEIVING MEDICAL ATTENTION OF ANY DESCRIPTION AND WHO NORMALLY RESIDE IN THE AREA SERVED BY THE WIRRAL HEALTH AUTHORITY AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY THE PROVISION OF PLAYING EQUIPMENT, ESSENTIAL MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND OCCUPATIONAL THERAPY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.