Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY EAST MOLESEY

Charity number: 1197566
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev NATHANIEL WILLIAM KURZ Chair 01 July 2018
ST MARY'S EAST MOLESEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Toby Charles Roderick Allen Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record
Sujith Piyankara Dharma-Ransi Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record
Timothy John Blair Trustee 14 September 2020
EMBRACING AGE
Received: On time
HUGH GORDON JAGGER Trustee 14 September 2020
ST MARY'S EAST MOLESEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ANDREW JOHN SAUL Trustee 14 September 2020
ST MARY'S EAST MOLESEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Joanna Rogers Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
DIANE SIMMS Trustee 01 July 2018
ST MARY'S EAST MOLESEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Katie Jean Lee Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
ALAN PETER RITCHIE FCA, CPFA Trustee 31 March 2013
None on record