ANIMAL WELFARE (FURNESS)

Charity number: 519065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £171.41k £139.24k £134.19k £159.97k £134.18k
Total expenditure £89.24k £105.46k £92.69k £99.49k £97.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £45.00k