Financial history FIRST DINNINGTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 519220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.84k £4.38k £6.99k £7.65k £14.47k
Total expenditure £5.91k £2.51k £6.72k £6.17k £7.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.97k