WORCESTERSHIRE COBHAM CRICKET TRUST

Charity number: 519258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.62k £11.08k £4.27k £14.06k £3.39k
Total expenditure £7.53k £54 £9.69k £161 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A