Trustees ST PADARNS PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1197903
Charity reporting is up to date (296 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marie Nicole Pugh-Jenkins | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Enid Teresa Brophy | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Rowe | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Beckett | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aliyah Rebecca Debbonaire | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kari Greengross | Trustee | 26 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra May Lloyd | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.