Trustees CBA YORKSHIRE
Charity number: 519581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Paxton Buglass MA MCIfA | Chair | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Denis Brian Waudby BA MA PhD | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fedor Kiyanenko | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Abramson MA, FSA | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Russell Watson MA, FCCA | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Leslie Turpin | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Josephine Heron | Trustee | 08 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY THUBRON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.