Trustees GREAT SMEATON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 519648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE PENELOPE CAIN | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA PIEKOSZ | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN THOMPSON | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JONES | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE EVANS | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE JOHNSTONE | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLARE LOGAN | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH SYKES | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.