Trustees Citizens Advice Oldham
Charity number: 519868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brenda Warrington | Chair | 05 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Margaret Anne Bradbury | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Diller | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Martyn Beauchamp | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|||||
David Trafford | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Emily Allen | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Peter Allen | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.