Financial history LONG EATON TWINNING ASSOCIATION - TOM SMITH BEQUEST

Charity number: 519910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £24 £10 £6 £6 £8
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £676 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A