Trustees MACCLESFIELD AND CONGLETON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 520227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Thomas Jacob | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Borg-Hefferman | Trustee | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ephram Luke Graves | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES BROWN | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARK RUSSELL EDEN | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Richard MacKintosh | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER JAMES FLETCHER | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Andrew Richmond | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Edward Taylor | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE MHAIRI HELEN ROBINSON | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.