Trustees URMSTON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 520234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM BARRICK | Chair |
|
||||||
Jennifer Carline | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wilson | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Jones | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||
William Outhwaite | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Connor O'Neill | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Neil Spear | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carole Knowles | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Pearce | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.