Financial history 1ST AND 4TH OFFERTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £14.53k £18.44k £9.16k £10.97k £21.68k
Total expenditure £11.94k £16.72k £8.81k £9.32k £17.77k
Income from government contracts N/A £450 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A