Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BOWLING ST STEPHEN

Charity number: 1200044
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JAMES WILLIAM HINTON Chair 16 June 2005
BANKFOOT PARTNERSHIP
Overdue by 1638 days
SHINE (WEST BOWLING)
Received: On time
Colin Marcus Wilcock Trustee 26 March 2023
None on record
David Stanley Thirkill Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Hannah Beatrice Owens Trustee 31 March 2021
None on record
Rev Hannah Elizabeth Raitt Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
Samantha Catherine Thirkill Trustee 31 March 2015
None on record
Susan Ingham Trustee 31 March 2014
None on record
SARAH JANE HINTON Trustee 24 April 2011
None on record
Louise Rebecca Mann Trustee 31 March 2011
None on record