Trustees WESLEY PLACE METHODIST CHURCH ALSAGER
Charity number: 1200390
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ROBERT OSMOND HILTON | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Isabel Brislen | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|||||
MARGARET KEELING | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Elizabeth Peake | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||
DAVID MICHAEL CROMPTON | Trustee | 21 June 1973 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Fawley Moors | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Celia Mary Crompton | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dorothy Anne Milner | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Valerie Snowden | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gwynneth Proudlove | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Helen Robertson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON JANE STEELE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Harriet Emily Weatherby Crompton | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Alicia Rose Weatherby Crompton | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Louise Simpson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Dale Shaw | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Natasha Jane Walker | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sandra Laura Rawlinson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Daniel Mark Keen | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.