Trustees THE JOSEPH HARRIS MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 520318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny McCulloch | Chair | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Gate | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Scrugham | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janette Pollitt | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Howard McCulloch | Trustee | 06 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gwynn LLoyd | Trustee | 09 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger James | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Sims | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.