MOSBOROUGH MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 520483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £182.45k £140.61k £176.65k £177.18k £32.63k
Total expenditure £133.66k £105.50k £133.36k £169.61k £160.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A