VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £15.55k £21.34k £18.97k £17.19k £19.23k
Total expenditure £15.32k £24.09k £17.95k £20.58k £10.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A