HOLMEWOOD MINERS WELFARE SCHEME

Charity number: 520552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.33k £7.99k £4.09k £4.47k £2.82k