Trustees DERWENT AND DOVE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 520668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY ERIC MICHAEL STEVENS MBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Edward James Cross | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Steeples | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Kate Smith | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Woodley Pimm | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Vera Blakeman | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Jones | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL FEARN | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ELLIOTT | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|||||
Christopher David Bunton | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR G A BEESON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.