Governing document LANGLEY PARK MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND
Charity number: 520783
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCES DATED 4 DECEMBER 1924 AND 28 SEPTEMBER 1934, LEASES DATED 16TH FEBRUARY 1953 AND 21 OCTOBER 1957 AND SCHEME OF 22 AUGUST 1984.
Charitable objects
A MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LANGLEY PARK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.